EP1837768 - Remote copy system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arakawa, Hiroshi Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Property Office 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Ninose, Kenta Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Property Office 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Hirakawa, Yusuke Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Property Office 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Asaka, Yoshihiro Hitachi, Ltd. Intell. Property Office 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2007/39] | Application number, filing date | 07010832.9 | 07.06.2004 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | JP20030403970 | 03.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003403970 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1837768 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1837768 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/20 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
G06F11/2058 (EP,US);
G06F11/2064 (EP,US);
G06F11/2071 (EP,US);
G06F11/2074 (EP,US);
G06F11/2082 (EP,US);
G06F2201/82 (EP,US);
G06F2201/835 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99952 (US);
Y10S707/99953 (US);
Y10S707/99955 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE [2007/39] | Title | German: | Fernkopiersystem | [2007/39] | English: | Remote copy system | [2007/39] | French: | Système de copie à distance | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 14.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2015 | 01.12.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/18] | 27.12.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/18] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04013357.1 / EP1538527 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040013357) is 03.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9745790 (EMC CORP [US]) [A] 1-56* the whole document *; | [A]EP0902370 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-56 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1150210 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-56 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1217523 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-56 * the whole document *; | [A]US6622152 (SINN RICHARD PONG NAM [US], et al) [A] 1-56 * the whole document * |