EP1865563 - Light assisted electro plating process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials, LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough Massachusetts 01752 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials, L.L.C. 455 Forest Street Marlborough Massachusetts 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Allardyce, George R. 2 Newquay Close, Nuneaton Warwickshire CV11 6FH / GB | 02 /
Bass, Kevin 232 Forest Road, Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 3HX / GB | 03 /
Rasch, Joachim Geislinger Strasse 41 73337 Bad Ueberkingen / DE | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2007/50] | Buckley, Guy Julian Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd. European Patent Department 4th Floor, 22 Tudor Street London EC4Y 0AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07010932.7 | 03.06.2007 | [2007/50] | Priority number, date | US20060810954P | 05.06.2006 Original published format: US 810954 P | US20060588520 | 27.10.2006 Original published format: US 588520 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1865563 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1865563 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, C25D3/46 | [2012/32] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,KR,US);
C25D7/126 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/1605 (EP,US);
C23C18/1608 (EP,US);
C23C18/1614 (EP,US);
C23C18/1642 (EP,US);
C23C18/165 (EP,US);
C23C18/1667 (EP,KR,US);
C23C18/38 (EP,US);
C23C18/42 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/011 (EP,KR,US);
C25D3/46 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/50] | H01L31/0224 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Licht-unterstütztes Galvanisieren | [2007/50] | English: | Light assisted electro plating process | [2007/50] | French: | Processus pour galvaniser à l'aide de lumière | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 09.11.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6620304 (HOFFACKER GERHARD [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6251249 (CHEVALIER JEAN W [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * column 6, line 39 - column 7, paragraph 56 *; | [Y]US2004040852 (RZEZNIK MARIA ANNA [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * paragraphs [0031] - [0035] *; | [AD]US5882435 (HOLDERMANN KONSTANTIN [DE]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US4251327 (GRENON LAWRENCE A) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5011565 (DUBE CHRISTOPHER E [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - METTE A ET AL, "Increasing the Efficiency of Screen-Printed Silicon Solar Cells by Light-Induced Silver Plating", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 2006 IEEE 4TH WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONVERSION (IEEE CAT. NO.06CH37747),, (20060501), ISBN 978-1-4244-0016-4, pages 1056 - 1059, XP031007489 [Y] 1-11 * the whole document * |