EP1892084 - Linear motor mounted press machine and method for controlling linear motor mounted press machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Change - representative | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA KIKAI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3 Minami, Ochiai-Cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601 / JP | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Hiroichi c/o Murata Kikai Kabushiki Kaisha Inuyama Factory, 2 Aza Nakajima Oaza Hashizume Inuyama-shi Aichi / JP | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Liedl, Christine, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Liedl, Christine, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 4b 82319 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Liedl, Christine, et al c/o Hansmann & Vogeser, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07010976.4 | 04.06.2007 | [2008/09] | Priority number, date | JP20060223781 | 21.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006223781 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1892084 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Classification | IPC: | B30B1/42, B30B1/00 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
B30B1/00 (EP,KR,US);
B30B1/42 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S72/707 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49803 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pressmaschine mit Linearmotor und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2008/09] | English: | Linear motor mounted press machine and method for controlling linear motor mounted press machine | [2008/09] | French: | Presse à moteur linéaire et son procédé de commande | [2008/09] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |