EP1847395 - Method of liquid filling of cartridge, liquid filling device, and cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uehara, Yutaka c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Morio c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Hiroshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 04 /
Toba, Koichi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011118.2 | 29.11.2005 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | JP20040343427 | 29.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004343427 | JP20040343428 | 29.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004343428 | JP20040343429 | 29.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004343429 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847395 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1847395 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, G03G15/08, B41J2/165 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
B41J2/17553 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17503 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17506 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,KR,US);
B41J2/17536 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Befüllen einer Kartusche mit Flüssigkeit, Füllvorrichtung und Kartusche | [2007/43] | English: | Method of liquid filling of cartridge, liquid filling device, and cartridge | [2007/43] | French: | Procédé de remplissage de liquide d'une cartouche, dispositif de remplissage de liquide et cartouche | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05025966.2 / EP1661710 | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | LT | 30.06.2010 | LV | 30.06.2010 | NL | 30.06.2010 | PL | 30.06.2010 | RO | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | TR | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | IS | 30.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | IE | 29.11.2010 | LU | 29.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | HU | 01.01.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
TR | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 29.11.2010 | ||
LU | 29.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 29.11.2010 | ||
LU | 29.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 29.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 29.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 29.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5329294 (ONTAWAR SUSAN P [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 55; figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 16 - column 2, line 19 *; | [A]US6007192 (AHN BYUNG-SUN [KR]) [A] 1-11* column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 56 *; | [A]US2003048339 (SASAKI TOYONORI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraphs [0068] - [0072] - [0111] * * paragraph [0102] *; | [A]WO2004023216 (WAZANA BROTHERS INTERNATIONAL [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 13 *; | [A]US2004066429 (WAZANA YOEL [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 2, line 65 - column 7, line 51; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2004174417 (KOBAYASHI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | Examination | US6364473 | by applicant | US6364473 |