EP1880719 - Composition for prophylaxis or treatment of urinary system infection and method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chih-Hsiung, Lin 1 F., No. 200, Hulin St. Shingyi District Taipei City / TW | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011162.0 | 06.06.2007 | [2008/04] | Priority number, date | US20060422924 | 08.06.2006 Original published format: US 422924 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1880719 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1880719 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K36/90, A61P13/00 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/04] | A61K31/00, A61P13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Title | German: | Zubereitung zur Prophylaxe oder Behandlung von Harnweginfektionen und entsprechendes Verfahren | [2008/04] | English: | Composition for prophylaxis or treatment of urinary system infection and method thereof | [2008/04] | French: | Composition pour la prophylaxie ou le traitement des infections du système urinaire et son procédé associé | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/36] | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2010 | Observations by third parties | 03.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/47] | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.2009 | 30.06.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03035610 ; | [X]WO0058278 ; | [X]CN1088442 (LI WENXU [CN]) [X] 1-4,6,8,11-14,17-20 * abstract *; | [X]CN1116533 (WANG ZHIMING [CN]) [X] 1-4,6,8,11-14,17-20 * abstract *; | [X]US6300514 (TAKAHASHI KANJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8,11,12,15,17-20 * column 162, line 45 - line 53 * * the whole document *; | [X]EP1167346 (ONO PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,4,6-8,11,12,15,17-20 * sentence 3, paragraph 105 * * sentence 5, paragraph 115 * * claims 7,10 *; | [X]EP1172361 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15,17-20 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0064] , [0065] *; | [X]WO0234753 (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8,11,12,15,17-20 * the whole document * * page 29, line 21 - line 23 * * page 56, line 33 *; | [A]EP1283048 (MARUZEN PHARM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4,6,8,11-14,17-20* the whole document *; | [X]WO03053915 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [X] 1,4,6-8,11,12,15,17-20 * the whole document * * page 23, line 1 * * page 26, line L, paragraph 2 * * claim 54 *; | [X]US2003139379 (WATANABE FUMIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15,17-20 * paragraphs [0306] - [0327] * * sentence 10, paragraph 327 * * the whole document *; | [X]WO03070711 (BRITISH BIOTECH PHARM [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15,17-20 * the whole document * * page 2, paragraph 4 * * claim 34 * * page 61, line 1 - page 62, line 3 *; | [X]WO2004014916 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8,11,12,15,17-20 * the whole document * * page 1 - page 50 * * page 51, line 5 * * page 51, line 10 - line 13 * * page 51, line 17 * * page 51, lines 22-25 * * page 54, line 1 - line 3 * * page 80, line 12 - page 82, line 29 * * page 89, line 9 *; | [X]WO2004101537 (BRITISH BIOTECH PHARM [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15,17-20 * the whole document * * claim 34 * * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 14, paragraph L - page 15, paragraph L * * page 61 *; | [X]EP1486207 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15,17-20 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0113] - [0119] * * page 83, line 14; claims 21,22 * * page 17, line 12 * * paragraphs [0071] , [0072] *; | [X]WO2005019194 (VERNALIS OXFORD LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15,17-20 * the whole document * * claims 24-26 *; | [X]CN1593530 (XIE ZILONG [CN]) [X] 1-4,6,8,11-14,17-20 * abstract *; | [X]CN1733272 (GUIYANG YUNYAN XICHUANG PHARM [CN]) [X] 1-4,6,8,11-14,17-20 * abstract *; | [X]CN1742963 (XU ZHONGHUI [CN]) [X] 1-4,6,8,11-14,17-20 * abstract *; | [X]WO2006028523 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8,11,12,15,17-20 * the whole document * * page 20, paragraph L * * page 21, line 15 * * page 21, line 20 * * page 22, line 13 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 39, Database accession no. 2003-421390, XP002450709 & WO03035610 A1 20030501 (SHIONOGI & CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15,17-20 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 60, Database accession no. 2000-628334, XP002450710 & WO0058278 A1 20001005 (SHIONOGI & CO LTD) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,11,12,14,15,17-20 * abstract * | other | - MOHD. SHAREEF KHAN, "Jullaab bara-e-warm-e-masaanah haar", TKDL, XP003026613 | - GOVINDA DASA, "Vrhadgoksuradyavalehah", TKDL, XP003026614 | - MOHD. AKBAR. ARZANI, "SAFOOF BARA.E. WARM-E-MASANAH", TKDL, XP003026615 | - MOHD. AKBAR ARZANI, "Brhadgoksuradyalehah", TKDL, XP003026616 | - MOHD. SHAREEF KHAN, "Safoof-e-Mudir", TKDL, XP003026617 | - NAGINADASAH CHAGANALALA SAHA, "Vrhadgoksuradyavalahah", TKDL, XP003026618 |