EP1830096 - A drive transmission apparatus for distribution of drive force [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | A drive transmission apparatus for vehicle and for a four-wheel drive vehicle | ||
[2008/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | For all designated states FUJI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo160-8316 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka 542-0081 / JP | ||
For all designated states FUJI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo160-8316 / JP | |||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8 Minamisemba 3-chome Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0081 / JP | ||
For all designated states FUJI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 7-2 Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo160-8316 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakata, Takatoshi c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 02 /
Yoshinami, Kouji c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0081 / JP | 03 /
Kanazawa, Kazuo c/o Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | 04 /
Murakami, Mamoru c/o Fuji Heavy Industries, Ltd. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | [2010/33] |
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
Sakata, Takatoshi c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0081 / JP | ||
02 /
Yoshinami, Kouji c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0081 / JP | |||
03 /
Kanazawa, Kazuo c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0081 / JP | |||
04 /
Murakami, Mamoru c/o JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-0081 / JP | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Popp, Eugen, et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011267.7 | 17.06.2003 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1830096 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1830096 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1830096 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D48/06, B60K17/35, B60K23/08, H02P6/18 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
B60K23/0808 (EP,US);
B60K17/35 (EP,US);
F16D48/06 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1026 (EP,US);
F16D2500/10431 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3028 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/36] | F16D48/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/36] | Title | German: | Antriebsübertragungsvorrichtung für Fahrzeuge und Fahrzeuge mit Allradantrieb | [2008/29] | English: | A drive transmission apparatus for distribution of drive force | [2008/29] | French: | Appareil de transmission de commande pour véhicule et véhicule à quatre roues motrices | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/36] | Antriebsübertragungsvorrichtung für Fahrzeuge und für Fahrzeuge mit Allradantrieb | ||
Former [2007/36] | A drive transmission apparatus for vehicle and for a four-wheel drive vehicle | Examination procedure | 04.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03013737.6 / EP1489329 | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003057050 (BANSBACH ERIC A [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * Paragraphs 6 and 26 to 30, figures 1 to 5, abstract *; | [A]EP1216875 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-9 * Paragraphs 18 to 43, figures 1 to 3, abstract *; | [A]US5448478 (ETO YOSHIYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * Column 2, line 42 to column 3, line 38, figure 1, abstract *; | [A]US6121736 (NARAZAKI KAZUSHIGE [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 13, line 51 - column 14, line 47; figure 1 * * column 24, line 64 - column 26, line 8; figure 9 * * column 36, line 4 - column 40, line 44; figures 18-20 * * abstract *; | [A]US5057753 (LEUTHOLD HANS M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 31 - column 6, line 28; figure 3 * * abstract *; | [A]WO0042698 (SEMIPOWER SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 6 - page 12; figures 4,6 * * abstract * | by applicant | US2003057050 | EP1216875 | US6121736 | US5057753 |