EP1912223 - Operating techniques for reducing the program and read disturbs of a non-volatile memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanDisk Corporation 601 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Li, Yan 1775 Milmont Drive Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 02 /
Chen, Jian 5476 Castle Glen Avenue San Jose, CA 95129 / US | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony, et al Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07011551.4 | 26.02.2003 | [2008/16] | Priority number, date | US20020086495 | 27.02.2002 Original published format: US 86495 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1912223 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1912223 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/34, G11C16/04 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
G11C16/3427 (EP,US);
G06F12/00 (KR);
G11C16/0483 (EP,US);
G11C16/12 (EP,US);
G11C16/28 (EP,US);
G11C16/3418 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Title | German: | Verfahrenstechniken zur Reduzierung von Programm- und Lesestörungen eines nicht-flüchtigen Speichers | [2008/16] | English: | Operating techniques for reducing the program and read disturbs of a non-volatile memory | [2008/16] | French: | Techniques de fonctionnement pour réduire le programme et les perturbations de lecture d'une mémoire non volatile | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 21.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03251165.1 / EP1341185 | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2010 | BE | 20.10.2010 | CY | 20.10.2010 | CZ | 20.10.2010 | DK | 20.10.2010 | EE | 20.10.2010 | FI | 20.10.2010 | HU | 20.10.2010 | IT | 20.10.2010 | SE | 20.10.2010 | SI | 20.10.2010 | SK | 20.10.2010 | TR | 20.10.2010 | BG | 20.01.2011 | GR | 21.01.2011 | ES | 31.01.2011 | PT | 21.02.2011 | IE | 26.02.2011 | LU | 26.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
TR | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
LU | 26.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 26.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
IT | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
ES | 31.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6072721 (ARASE KENSHIRO [JP]); | [X]EP1137012 (MICROCHIP TECH INC [US]); | [X]US2001038118 (SAKUI KOJI [JP], et al) |