EP1878590 - Rubber composition for covering carcass cord and tire having carcass using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunisawa, Tetsuya Sumitomo Rubber Industries, Ltd. 6-9, Wakinohama-cho 3-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/03] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07011595.1 | 13.06.2007 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | JP20060192511 | 13.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006192511 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878590 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1878590 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/00, C08K3/36, C08K5/372, C08K5/548 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
B60C1/0041 (EP,US);
C08K3/36 (EP,US);
C08K5/0025 (EP,US);
C08K5/372 (EP,US);
C08K5/548 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/36, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/372, C08L21/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/548, C08L21/00 (US,EP);
C08L21/00, C08K3/36, C08K5/0025, C08K5/372, C08K5/548, C08L81/04 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L7/00, C08K3/36, C08K5/0025, C08K5/372, C08K5/548, C08L81/04 (EP,US) (-) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2008/39] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gummizusammensetzung zur Karkassenkordabdeckung und Reifen mit Karkasse damit | [2008/03] | English: | Rubber composition for covering carcass cord and tire having carcass using same | [2008/03] | French: | Composition en caoutchouc pour couvrir le corps de la carcasse, et pneu ayant cette carcasse | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 17.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4421899 (YAMAZAKI NOBORU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4 * examples 1-6; claims 1,2; table 1 *; | [X]EP1077228 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019]; examples 1,2; claims 1,2,7-9; tables 1,3 *; | [Y]EP1323549 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0032]; example B; claims 1,6,8; table 1 *; | [Y]EP1652693 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 1-3* paragraphs [0017] - [0023]; examples 1,2; claim 1 *; | [PX]EP1686151 (SUMTIOMO RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * page 3, line 47, paragraphs 20-24; example 4; claims 1,2 *; | [PX]EP1690895 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * paragraphs [0042] - [0046]; examples 22,23; table 3 *; | [PX]EP1792937 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * paragraphs [0017] - [0025]; example 4; claims 1,2; table 2 * |