EP2006116 - Safety element with colour-switching effect and visually imperceptible safety characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.04.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hueck Folien Ges.m.b.H. Gewerbepark 30 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT | [2008/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keplinger, Jürgen, Dr. Nr. 148 4351 Saxen / AT | 02 /
Kammerer, Hans Hermann Im Wiesengrund 5 92637 Weiden / DE | 03 /
Müller, Matthias Fichtenweg 4 92699 Bechtsrieth / DE | 04 /
Bergsmann, Martin, Dr. Martinelligang 11 4020 Linz / AT | [2008/52] | Representative(s) | Landgraf, Elvira Schulfeld 26 4210 Gallneukirchen / AT | [2012/32] |
Former [2008/52] | Landgraf, Elvira Schulfeld 26 4210 Gallneukirchen / AT | Application number, filing date | 07012111.6 | 21.06.2007 | [2008/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2006116 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2006116 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00, B42D15/10 | [2008/52] | CPC: |
B42D25/29 (EP,US);
B42D25/373 (US);
B42D25/00 (EP);
B42D25/364 (US);
B42D25/369 (US);
B42D2035/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/52] | Title | German: | Sicherheitselement mit Farbkippeffekt und visuell nicht erkennbaren Sicherheitsmerkmalen | [2008/52] | English: | Safety element with colour-switching effect and visually imperceptible safety characteristics | [2008/52] | French: | Elément de sécurité à couleur variable selon l'orientation et signes de sécurité ne pouvant pas être reconnus visuellement | [2008/52] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/52] | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH Prinzregentenstr. 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Zeuner, Stefan Zeuner Summerer Stütz Nußbaumstrasse 8 80336 München / DE | [2013/24] | 12.06.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 12.12.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.12.2016 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/28] | 22.02.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2007 | CH | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | LI | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | MC | 08.08.2012 | MT | 08.08.2012 | NL | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | IE | 21.06.2013 | LU | 21.06.2013 | BE | 30.06.2013 | [2017/43] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 21.06.2007 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.06.2013 | ||
LU | 21.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 21.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MC | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 08.08.2012 | |
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 08.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0752323 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11,12* the whole document *; | [DXY]WO0218155 (NOVEMBER AG MOLEKULARE MEDIZIN [DE], et al) [DX] 1-4,10,12 * the whole document * [Y] 5-9; | [X]WO2004028824 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 11 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2005108108 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 5-9 * pages 1-24 *; | [X]DE102004021246 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 11 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0049] - [0100]; claims 49,50 * |