Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7556013 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2009 | B2 | US2008047503 | 28.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2006230952 | 28.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4672620B | Global Dossier | 20.04.2011 | B2 | JP2008051077 | 06.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006230952 | 28.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1895138 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2011 | B1 | EP1895138 | 08.09.2010 | A3 | EP1895138 | 05.03.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2006230952 | 28.08.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0702759 | 22.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2006230952 | 28.08.2006 |