EP2008556 - Cooking unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayir, Huseyin 221 Ildertom Road London SE15 1NS / GB | [2009/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/01] | Representative(s) | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | Wright, Howard Hugh Burnby Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07012630.5 | 28.06.2007 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2008556 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/12 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
A47J37/1295 (EP);
A47J37/0611 (EP);
A47J27/04 (EP);
A47J43/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/36] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kocheinheit | [2009/01] | English: | Cooking unit | [2009/01] | French: | unité de cuisson | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9526912 (GRANDI RENE [IT]) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 10 - line 13 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 11 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US5715743 (GODDARD RONALD J [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 29 - line 33 * * column 3, line 58 - line 64 * * figures 3,5 *; | [X]US2323623 (PORTER GEORGE W, et al) [X] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 34 - page 2, column 1, line 44 * * figures 1,4-8 *; | [A]US2005235838 (COHN ROBERT [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 69 - page 5, paragraph 71 * * page 5, paragraph 80 - page 6, paragraph 85 * * figures 19-26,33,34 * |