EP2015197 - Method and file system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaeta, Giovanni Via Delle Primule 37/11 16148 Genua / IT | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Fischer, Michael, et al Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07012758.4 | 29.06.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015197 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
G06F16/1724 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Dateiensystem | [2009/03] | English: | Method and file system | [2009/03] | French: | Procédé et système de fichiers | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 24.01.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5890169 (WONG THOMAS K [US], et al) [A] 1-13* column 7, lines 24-51 *; | [A]WO9915954 (SONY PICTURES ENTERTAINMENT [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, lines 14-16 *; | [X]US2002138505 (FABRIZIO DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | Examination | US6745311 |