EP1875947 - Element and assembly for retaining a shoe on a snowboard or a skateboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Salomon S.A. Les Croiselets 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szafranski, Pierre 61 Rue de la Grenette 74370 Metz-Tessy / FR | 02 /
Thomas, Pascal 16 Rue des Muses Galantes, Jacob-Bellecombette 73000 Chambéry / FR | [2008/02] | Application number, filing date | 07012889.7 | 02.07.2007 | [2008/02] | Priority number, date | FR20060006220 | 07.07.2006 Original published format: FR 0606220 | [2008/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1875947 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63C9/00 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
A63C9/005 (EP,US);
A63C2009/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Title | German: | Element und Anordnung zur Befestigung eines Schuhs auf einem Snowboard oder Skateboard | [2008/02] | English: | Element and assembly for retaining a shoe on a snowboard or a skateboard | [2008/02] | French: | Elément et ensemble de retenue d'une chaussure sur une planche de glisse ou de roulage | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 18.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE3201319 (ESS SKIBINDUNGEN [DE]) [DY] 1,2 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 18; figure 2 *; | [Y]FR2638653 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [Y] 5 * figures 9,10 *; | [A]FR2638654 (SALOMON SA [FR]) [A] 7,9-11* figures 1-5 *; | [Y]DE4005446 (VARPAT PATENTVERWERTUNG [CH]) [Y] 1,2 * figure 3 *; | [A]US5529331 (HOELZL KLAUS [AT], et al) [A] 7,9-11 * figures 3-5,7,8 *; | [XY]FR2870750 (LOOK FIXATIONS SA SA [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,12,13 * page 6, line 13 - page 12, line 14; figures 6-11 * [Y] 5 |