EP1876416 - Surveying apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TOPCON 75-1, Hasunuma-cho, Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Shinji Kabushiki Kaisha Topcon 75-1, Hasunuma-cho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 174-8580 / JP | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ P.O. BOX 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013233.7 | 06.07.2007 | [2008/02] | Priority number, date | JP20060187877 | 07.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006187877 | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1876416 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1876416 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01C15/00 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
G01C15/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [2009/28] |
Former [2008/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vermessungsvorrichtung | [2008/02] | English: | Surveying apparatus | [2008/02] | French: | Appareil de surveillance | [2008/02] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 29.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH676042 (WILD LEITZ AG) [A] 1-5* page 5, paragraphs 2-5 - page 6, paragraphs 1-3; figures 8-11 *; | [X]US5216480 (KANEKO ATSUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]EP1061335 (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0038] , [0043] *; | [X]EP1422500 (TOPCON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - paragraphs [0027] , [0027] *; | [X]US2004163266 (KANEKO KENJI [JP]) [X] 1-4,5 * paragraphs [0008] - [0014] - [0020] , [0031] - paragraphs [0048] - [0050] - [0056] , [0068]; figure 6 * |