EP2011566 - Apparatus for cleaning waste sulphuric acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLINKE GmbH Kaiser-Friedrich-Promenade 24 61348 Bad Homburg / DE | [2009/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henke, Lüder An der Kreuzheck 12 60529 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Pataky, Peter Heuchelheimer Strasse 119 61350 Bad Homburg / DE | 03 /
Hetzel, Joachim An der Billwiese 11 61440 Oberursel / DE | 04 /
Winterbauer, Hansjürgen Breslauer Strasse 49 61191 Rosbach / DE | [2010/50] |
Former [2009/02] | 01 /
Henke, Lüder An der Kreuzheck 12 60529 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02 /
Pataky, Peter Heuchelheimer Strasse 119 61350 Bad Homburg / DE | |||
03 /
Hetzel, Joachim An der Billwiese 11 61440 Oberursel / DE | |||
04 /
Winterbauer, Hansjürgen, Dr. Breslauer Strasse 49 61191 Rosbach / DE | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Knoblauch, Andreas Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013238.6 | 06.07.2007 | [2009/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2011566 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2011566 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/02, C22C38/02, F28F21/08, B22D25/06 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
F28F21/08 (EP);
B01J19/02 (EP);
B22D18/04 (EP);
B22D25/06 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
F28D7/106 (EP);
B01J2219/0011 (EP);
B01J2219/0245 (EP);
B01J2219/0286 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Apparatur zur Reinigung von Abfallschwefelsäure | [2009/02] | English: | Apparatus for cleaning waste sulphuric acid | [2009/02] | French: | Appareil destiné au nettoyage d'acide sulfurique de déchets | [2009/02] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 13.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.12.2010 | CZ | 15.12.2010 | DK | 15.12.2010 | EE | 15.12.2010 | FI | 15.12.2010 | IE | 15.12.2010 | LT | 15.12.2010 | LV | 15.12.2010 | MT | 15.12.2010 | RO | 15.12.2010 | SE | 15.12.2010 | SI | 15.12.2010 | SK | 15.12.2010 | BG | 15.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | ES | 26.03.2011 | IS | 15.04.2011 | PT | 15.04.2011 | LU | 06.07.2011 | BE | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/21] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
BE | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
MT | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
DK | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
RO | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
SK | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
CZ | 15.12.2010 | ||
EE | 15.12.2010 | ||
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
GR | 16.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
IS | 15.04.2011 | ||
PT | 15.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
IE | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
ES | 26.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 15.12.2010 | |
FI | 15.12.2010 | ||
LT | 15.12.2010 | ||
LV | 15.12.2010 | ||
SE | 15.12.2010 | ||
SI | 15.12.2010 | ||
BG | 15.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 15.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE3050562 (FRIEDRICHSFELD GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1-19 * page 6, lines 9-14; figure 1 * * page 16, lines 8-11 *; | [DY]EP0117986 (BERTRAMS AG [CH]) [DY] 1-19 * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 12; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4221874 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-3 *; | [DY]DE19807632 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DY] 1-19 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 46; figure 1 *; | [A] - CHANDLEY, DIXON G., "use of vacuum for gravity casting of metals", MAT. RES. INNOVAT., springer / heidelberg, ISSN 1432-8917, (1999), pages 14 - 23, (20061217), XP002462832 [A] 1 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s100190050120 |