EP1878489 - Fluidized bed apparatus and filter washing method for fluidized bed apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2010 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Freund Corporation 34F Oak Tower, 8-1, Nishishinjuku 6-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-6034 / JP | [2008/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamanaka, Kuniaki c/o Freund Corporation 34F Oak-Tower 8-1,Nishishinjuku 6-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-6034 / JP | 02 /
Isobe, Shigemi c/o Freund Corporation 34F Oak-Tower 8-1,Nishishinjuku 6-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-6034 / JP | 03 /
Unosawa, Kazuomi c/o Freund Corporation 34F Oak-Tower 8-1,Nishishinjuku 6-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-6034 / JP | 04 /
Takei, Narimichi c/o Freund Corporation 34F Oak-Tower 8-1,Nishishinjuku 6-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-6034 / JP | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013260.0 | 06.07.2007 | [2008/03] | Priority number, date | JP20060189529 | 10.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006189529 | [2008/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1878489 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/16, B01D46/00 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
B01D46/2411 (EP);
B01D46/762 (EP);
B01D46/79 (EP);
B01J2/16 (EP);
B01D2273/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wirbelbettvorrichtung und Filterwaschverfahren für eine Wirbelbettvorrichtung | [2008/03] | English: | Fluidized bed apparatus and filter washing method for fluidized bed apparatus | [2008/03] | French: | Appareil de lit fluidisé et méthode de lavage de filtre pour appareil de lit fluidisé | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |