EP2014813 - Method of manufacturing a consolidated nonwoven fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oskar Dilo Maschinenfabrik KG Im Hohenend 11 69412 Eberbach / DE | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dilo, Johann P., Dipl.-Ing. An der Itterbrücke 3 69412 Eberbach / DE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartmbB Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Wächter, Jochen, et al Kroher-Strobel Rechts- und Patentanwälte Bavariaring 20 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013400.2 | 09.07.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014813 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2014813 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/74, D01G25/00, G01B21/08 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
D04H1/74 (EP,US);
D04H1/46 (EP,US);
D04H18/00 (EP,US);
D04H5/02 (EP,US);
D04H5/03 (EP,US);
G01B21/08 (EP,US);
Y10T442/682 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT [2009/38] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer verfestigten Vliesstoffbahn | [2009/03] | English: | Method of manufacturing a consolidated nonwoven fabric | [2009/03] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un non tissée consolidé | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 15.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2080716 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 55-63; claims 1,4,5 *; | [A]JPS58187210 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE19743279 (VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECH PATENT [DE]) [A] 1 * claims 1-6 ** figure 2 *; | [Y]EP1319492 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0067] * * claims 5,16,21 *; | [Y]EP1715093 (DILO KG MASCHF OSKAR [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0010] * * claims 1,6 * | by applicant | EP0315930 | US6434795 | EP1057906 | EP1319492 | EP1715093 |