EP1844858 - Apparatus for treating fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/42] | Method and apparatus for treating fluids | ||
[2011/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VRTX Technologies, LLC 5850 Corridor Parkway Schertz, TX 78154 / US | [2011/39] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Lancer Partnership, Ltd. 6655 Lancer Blvd. San Antonio, TX 78219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Romanyszyn, Michael T. 3720 Running Springs San Antonio Texas 78261 / US | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | ||
Former [2007/42] | Shanks, Andrew, et al Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square GB-Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 07013580.1 | 05.07.2001 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | US20000216444P | 06.07.2000 Original published format: US 216444 P | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1844858 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1844858 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/34, B01F5/02, B01F5/06, C02F1/20, B01J19/24, B02C19/06, F15D1/02 | [2007/42] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/42] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von Flüssigkeiten | [2011/27] | English: | Apparatus for treating fluids | [2011/27] | French: | Appareil de traitement de liquides | [2011/27] |
Former [2007/42] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung von Flüssigkeiten | ||
Former [2007/42] | Method and apparatus for treating fluids | ||
Former [2007/42] | Procédé et appareil de traitement des liquides | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01950877.9 / EP1322425 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010950877) is 06.03.2007 | Opposition(s) | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 12.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | CY | 30.11.2011 | DK | 30.11.2011 | FI | 30.11.2011 | IT | 30.11.2011 | SE | 30.11.2011 | TR | 30.11.2011 | GR | 01.03.2012 | PT | 30.03.2012 | IE | 05.07.2012 | LU | 05.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
TR | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 05.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
IE | 05.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
FI | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.11.2011 | |
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
IT | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
DK | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
CY | 30.11.2011 | ||
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 30.11.2011 | |
SE | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SE | 30.11.2011 | |
GR | 01.03.2012 | ||
PT | 30.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | GR | 01.03.2012 | |
PT | 30.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0124493 (ITALSIL SPA [IT]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]US4538764 (DUNBAR RICHARD M [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]WO9000526 (QUINETICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 19 * * page 10, line 33 - page 11, line 11 * * abstract *; | [X]US4957626 (ASHBROOK CLIFFORD L [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]US5318702 (ASHBROOK CLIFFORD L [US]) [X] 1-4* abstract *; | [X]US5435913 (ASHBROOK CLIFFORD L [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]WO9931015 (ASHBROOK CLIFFORD L [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract * |