EP2014256 - Composite bone repair material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Straumann Holding AG Peter Merian-Weg 12 4002 Basel / CH | For all designated states CAM Implants B.V. Zernikedreef 6 2333 CL Leiden / NL | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seibl, Reinhart Wohnstadion Kirchenacker 1 8050 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Neidhardt, Astrid Sylvia Trittligasse 34 8001 Zürich / CH | 03 /
Molenberg, Aaldert Rens Benkenstrasse 38 4102 Binningen / CH | 04 /
Beuling, Nienke van Bleyswijckstraat 59 2613 RR Delft / NL | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07013645.2 | 12.07.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2014256 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00, A61L27/42, A61L27/54, A61L27/56 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
A61L27/56 (EP,US);
A61F2/28 (EP,US);
A61L27/425 (EP,US);
A61L27/52 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
A61F2/2803 (EP,US);
A61F2/30942 (EP,US);
A61F2002/2835 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30011 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00293 (EP,US);
A61L2300/252 (EP,US);
A61L2300/412 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | Verbundmaterial zur Knochenreparatur | [2009/03] | English: | Composite bone repair material | [2009/03] | French: | Matériau de réparation d'os composite | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19610715 (KIRSCH AXEL [DE]) [X] 1-3,10,12,13 * column 1, lines 1-3,38-40,46-55,66,67 * * column 2, lines 16-19,38-66 * * column 3, lines 20,21,35-37,44,45; claims 1-12 *; | [Y]WO0044808 (HUBBELL JEFFREY A [CH], et al) [Y] 4-7,11,14,15 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 26 * * page 6, lines 11-24 * * page 15, line 19 - page 17, line 6 * * page 18, lines 13-22 * * page 24, lines 2-7 * * page 25, lines 8-13 * * page 27, lines 14-16 * * page 28, lines 10-15 * * example 13 * * page 84, lines 1-15 *; | [DA]WO03040235 (UNIV ZUERICH [CH], et al) [DA] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2003143258 (KNAACK DAVID [US], et al) [DA] 1-19* the whole document *; | [XY]US2004002770 (KING RICHARD S [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,12,13,16-19 * paragraphs [0012] - [0015] - [0020] - [0029] - [0032] , [0033] , [0035] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0040] , [0041] , [0047] , [0048] , [0055] - [0057] - [0064] - [0066] * * claims 1-43 * [Y] 4-7,11,14,15; | [DA]EP1609491 (STRAUMANN HOLDING AG [CH]) [DA] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1820522 (STRAUMANN HOLDING AG [CH]) [E] 1-19 * paragraphs [0017] - [0026] - [0030] - [0076]; claims 1-38 * |