EP2015608 - Interactive selection of a service during a mobile terminating call with service change and UDI fallback ("SCUDIF") [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wopkes, Marco Daxenäckerweg 31 a 85748 Garching b. München / DE | 02 /
Zaus, Robert, Dr. Gotthardstrasse 47 80686 München / DE | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60 81617 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60 81617 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07013838.3 | 13.07.2007 | [2009/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015608 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/18 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
H04W76/10 (EP);
H04W28/18 (EP);
H04W48/08 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W76/20 (EP);
H04W84/042 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/38] |
Former [2009/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Interaktive Auswahl eines Dienstes während eines an eine Mobilstation gerichteten Anrufes mit Dienstwechsel und UDI-Fallback (SCUDIF) | [2009/03] | English: | Interactive selection of a service during a mobile terminating call with service change and UDI fallback ("SCUDIF") | [2009/03] | French: | Sélection interactive d'un service lors d'un appel de terminaison mobile dotée d'un changement de service et de repli (UDI (SCUDIF) | [2009/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 25.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02052811 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 1,2,6-10,13,15,17 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - line 19 * * page 8, line 18 - page 10, line 13 *; | [Y]US2005221826 (LEE HYUN-JEONG [KR]) [Y] 1-4,6-10,13,15-17 * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 1,4,6a *; | [A]WO2006079358 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 1, line 9 - line 11 * * page 1, line 27 - line 34 * * page 7, line 7 - line 24 * * page 10, line 12 - line 33 * * page 11, line 20 - line 29 ** figures 3,4 *; | [Y] - 3GPP, "Technical Specification group Core Network and Terminals; Technical realization of Circuit Switched (CS) multimedia service UDI/RDI fallback and service modification; Stage 2 (Release 7)", 3GPP TS 23.172 V7.0.0, (200706), pages 1 - 59, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/23%5Fseries/23.172/, (20071213), XP002462357 [Y] 3,4,16 * page 10, paragraph 4.2.2 * * page 7, paragraph 4 * |