EP1918015 - Flue gas equilibration in waste incineration plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CheMin GmbH Am Mittleren Moos 46 A 86167 Augsburg / DE | [2013/23] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states CheMin GmbH Am Mittleren Moos 48 86167 Augsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krüger, Jörg, Dr. Geranienweg 22 92421 Schwandorf / DE | 02 /
Spiegel, Wolfgang, Dr. Dr. Rothermel-Strasse 16 86415 Mering / DE | 03 /
Jordan, Renate, Dr. Pariser Strasse 13 81667 München / DE | 04 /
Magel, Gabriele, Dr. Uhlandstrasse 9 86157 Augsburg / DE | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, et al Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas, et al Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [2008/19] | Müller-Wolff, Thomas Patentanwalt, Postfach 19 02 17 53037 Bonn / DE | Application number, filing date | 07014158.5 | 19.07.2007 | [2008/19] | Priority number, date | DE20061049506 | 16.10.2006 Original published format: DE102006049506 | [2008/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1918015 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1918015 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/50, B01D53/68, B01D53/70, B01D53/86, F23G5/00, F23G5/50, F23J7/00, F23J15/00 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
B01D53/508 (EP);
B01D53/685 (EP);
B01D53/70 (EP);
B01D53/8609 (EP);
B01D53/8659 (EP);
B01D53/8662 (EP);
F23G5/006 (EP);
F23G5/50 (EP);
F23J15/003 (EP);
F23J7/00 (EP);
F23C2900/99008 (EP);
F23G2207/60 (EP);
Y02E20/34 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/19] | B01D53/50, B01D53/68, B01D53/70, B01D53/86, F23J15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Title | German: | Rauchgas-Äquilibrierung in Müllverbrennungsanlagen | [2008/19] | English: | Flue gas equilibration in waste incineration plants | [2008/19] | French: | Equilibrage des gaz de fumées dans des installations de combustion de déchets | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2007 | CY | 13.03.2013 | CZ | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | EE | 13.03.2013 | FI | 13.03.2013 | IT | 13.03.2013 | LT | 13.03.2013 | LV | 13.03.2013 | MC | 13.03.2013 | MT | 13.03.2013 | NL | 13.03.2013 | PL | 13.03.2013 | RO | 13.03.2013 | SE | 13.03.2013 | SI | 13.03.2013 | SK | 13.03.2013 | TR | 13.03.2013 | BG | 13.06.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | ES | 24.06.2013 | IS | 13.07.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | AT | 19.07.2013 | GB | 19.07.2013 | IE | 19.07.2013 | LU | 19.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | FR | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
MT | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
AT | 19.07.2013 | ||
GB | 19.07.2013 | ||
IE | 19.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
AT | 19.07.2013 | ||
GB | 19.07.2013 | ||
IE | 19.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
GB | 19.07.2013 | ||
IE | 19.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
GB | 19.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
GB | 19.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
GB | 19.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 13.03.2013 | |
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | CZ | 13.03.2013 | |
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 13.03.2013 | |
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | EE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]AT273902B (BLEIBERGER BERGWERKS UNION AG) [Y] 3 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP0346100 (SEAHAWK CORP [BB]) [X] 1,4,5 * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 17; figure 2; claim - *; | [A]US4975257 (LIN PING-WHA [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 13, lines 42-45 *; | [A]EP0702078 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO9620779 (WILSON HAROLD W [US]) [X] 1-3 * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 1 *; | [X]EP1050333 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0017] - [0026] - [0044] , [0045] , [0064] - [0077]; figure 2; claim - *; | [XY]DE10021517 (KUELPS HEINZ JUERGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0015]; claims 1,3,4 * [Y] 3; | [E]EP1865257 (CHEMIN GMBH [DE]) [E] 4,5* figures 1-3 * | by applicant | EP0346100 | DE10021517 | EP1865257 |