EP1841095 - Method and system for mobile communications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS NETWORK INC. 10-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8436 / JP | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tamura, Motoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Miki, Mutsumaru c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Okamoto, Akiko c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
Kusunose, Kenya c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
Uchikoshi, Akihiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 06 /
Igarashi, Daisuke c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 07 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 08 /
Sato, Takaaki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 09 /
Hagiwara, Junichiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 10 /
Watanabe, Yasuyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 11 /
Hamajima, Takuya c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 12 /
Hata, Masafumi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 13 /
Ishikawa, Nobutaka c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 14 /
Yasuda, Yoshiyuki c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 15 /
Yunoki, Kazufumi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 16 /
Uchiyama, Nobuhide c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, INC. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
Tamura, Motoshi NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Miki, Mutsumaru NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Okamoto, Akiko NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
04 /
Kusunose, Kenya NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
05 /
Uchikoshi, Akihiro NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
06 /
Igarashi, Daisuke NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
07 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
08 /
Sato, Takaaki NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
09 /
Hagiwara, Junichiro NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
10 /
Watanabe, Yasuyuki NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
11 /
Hamajima, Takuya NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
12 /
Hata, Masafumi NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
13 /
Ishikawa, Nobutaka NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
14 /
Yasuda, Yoshiyuki NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
15 /
Yunoki, Kazufumi NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
16 /
Uchiyama, Nobuhide NTT DoCoMo, Inc. IP Dept. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
Former [2007/40] | 01 /
Tamura, Motoshi 18-2-101, Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | ||
02 /
Miki, Mutsumaru 18-2-105, Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi, Kanqagawa 239-0841 / JP | |||
03 /
Okamoto, Akiko Green Gables C-101 12-14 Tokuyoshi Higashi 1-chome, Kokura, Minami-ku Kitakyusyu-shi, Fukuoka 803-0277 / JP | |||
04 /
Kusunose, Kenya 6-1-302, Hikarinooka Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0847 / JP | |||
05 /
Uchikoshi, Akihiro 18-2-304, Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | |||
06 /
Igarashi, Daisuke 6-1-508, Hikarinooka Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0847 / JP | |||
07 /
Yamagata, Katsuhiko 1-22-3-302, Kosugaya Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 247-0007 / JP | |||
08 /
Sato, Takaaki 18-4-704, Nobe 4-chome Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | |||
09 /
Hagiwara, Junichiro Adorabure Kuriki A-101, 2-35-3, Kuriki, Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0041 / JP | |||
10 /
Watanabe, Yasuyuki 18-4-603, Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | |||
11 /
Hamajima, Takuya 606, Marine Heim 1283-3 Tauraminato-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 237-0071 / JP | |||
12 /
Hata, Masafumi 3-301 Daikan Plaza City 1-8, Yasuura-cho Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 238-0012 / JP | |||
13 /
Ishikawa, Nobutaka 202, Bell Light Nokenadai 18-11, Nokendai-tori Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0053 / JP | |||
14 /
Yasuda, Yoshiyuki 6-13-31, Okamura Isogo-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0021 / JP | |||
15 /
Yunoki, Kazufumi 18-4-304, Nobi 4-chome Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa 239-0841 / JP | |||
16 /
Uchiyama, Nobuhide 20-1-201, Yoshimien 9-chome Sacki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima 731-5132 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07014165.0 | 24.04.1998 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP19970123782 | 24.04.1997 Original published format: JP 12378297 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1841095 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1841095 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W80/04, // H04W88/12, H04W36/08, H04B7/022, H04W12/06 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
H04B7/022 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (KR);
H04W12/02 (KR);
H04W12/03 (EP,US);
H04W36/302 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/04 (EP,US);
H04W52/24 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04W72/0466 (KR);
H04W84/042 (EP,US);
H04W88/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/12 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/18] | H04B7/26, H04W12/02, // H04B7/02, H04W84/04 | ||
Former IPC [2007/40] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur mobilen Kommunikation | [2007/40] | English: | Method and system for mobile communications | [2007/40] | French: | Procédé et système pour communications mobiles | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 13.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 24.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/50] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98917680.5 / EP0978958 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980917680) is 08.10.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 20.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US5319712 (FINKELSTEIN LOUIS D [US], et al); | [X]EP0714180 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [XYI]WO9713353 (OMNIPOINT CORP [US], et al); |