EP2018906 - Heat exchange unit for isothermal chemical reactors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METHANOL CASALE S.A. Via Giulio Pocobelli, 6 6900 Lugano-Besso / CH | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbieri, Agostino Viale Europa 20 26017 Pieranica (CR) / IT | 02 /
Sorlini, Nicola Via A. Fantoni 35 24060 Sovere (BG) / IT | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco, et al M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/05] | Zardi, Marco, et al M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 07014177.5 | 19.07.2007 | [2009/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2018906 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/02, F28D9/00, F28F3/08 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
B01J8/0285 (EP,US);
B01J19/249 (EP,US);
B01J8/025 (EP,US);
F28D9/0031 (EP,US);
F28F13/06 (EP,US);
B01J2208/0015 (EP,US);
B01J2208/022 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00085 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2455 (EP,US);
B01J2219/246 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2462 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2481 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/40] |
Former [2009/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmetauscheinheit für isotherme chemische Reaktoren | [2009/05] | English: | Heat exchange unit for isothermal chemical reactors | [2009/05] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur pour réacteurs chimiques isothermes | [2009/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/03] | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR784885 (STUDIEN UND VERWERTUNGS GES M); | [X]DE914131 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG); | [X]US5035867 (DANG VU QUANG [FR], et al); | [DA]EP1306126 (METHANOL CASALE SA [CH]); | [A]EP1563900 (METHANOL CASALE SA [CH]) |