EP1882406 - Moveable collecting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Sebastian 5A, rue de Siltzheim 57910 Hambach / FR | [2008/05] | Application number, filing date | 07014295.5 | 20.07.2007 | [2008/05] | Priority number, date | DE20061035144 | 29.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006035144 | [2008/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1882406 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01D43/063, E01H1/04 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
A01D43/0635 (EP);
E01H1/047 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Title | German: | Fahrbare Sammelmaschine | [2008/05] | English: | Moveable collecting machine | [2008/05] | French: | Collecteur transportable | [2008/05] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 12.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8600003 (TAARUP AS MASKINFAB [DK]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8 * page 3, line 11 - page 7, line 9; figures 1-5 *; | [DA]DE4232541 (GAMALDI PAUL M [US]) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [X]EP0610062 (ELECTROLUX OUTDOOR PROD LTD [GB]) [X] 1,7,8 * column 3, line 1 - column 3, line 52; figures 1-5 *; | [X]EP0692576 (R C M S P A [IT]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 59; figures 1-3 * |