EP2017468 - Method for wind turbine yaw control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2019 [2019/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stiesdal, Henrik Norrevoldgade 45 5000 Odense C / DK | [2009/04] | Application number, filing date | 07014330.0 | 20.07.2007 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2017468 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
F03D7/0204 (EP,US);
G01P13/02 (EP,US);
G01P5/06 (EP,US);
G01P5/16 (EP,US);
G01P5/24 (EP,US);
F05B2270/304 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Seitensteuerung einer Windturbine | [2009/04] | English: | Method for wind turbine yaw control | [2009/04] | French: | Procédé pour le contrôle de lacet d'éolienne | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/18] | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2067247 (ERNO RAUMFAHRTTECHNIK GMBH) [X] 1-15 * page 1, lines 11-28 * * page 1, lines 59-91 * * page 2, lines 2-19 * * page 2, lines 51-78 * * page 2, line 120 - page 3, line 14 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE20114351U (FRICK MARTIN [DE], et al) [A] 3,4 * page 3, lines 15-22 * * page 9, lines 13-29 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US2004201220 (ANDERSEN STEPHEN M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10,12,13,15 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 33 * * page 7, paragraph 50 * * figures 4-6 *; | [A]WO2005093435 (FORSKNINGSCT RISOE [DK], et al) [A] 3,4 * page 5, lines 9-17 * * page 6, line 18 - page 8, line 17 * * page 11, lines 14-23 ** figures 1-19 * | Examination | WO2007045940 | by applicant | GB2067247 | DE20114351U | US2004201220 | WO2005093435 |