EP1884303 - Method for centring workpieces and device for performing such a method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebr. Heller Maschinenfabrik GmbH Gebrüder-Heller-Strasse 15 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roth, Werner Nikomödiestrasse 34 73252 Lenningen / DE | 02 /
Hartl, Werner Rechbergstrasse 9 72141 Walddorf-Häslach / DE | [2008/32] |
Former [2008/06] | 01 /
Roth, Werner Nikomödiestrasse 34 73252 Lenningen / DE | Representative(s) | Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/06] | Jackisch-Kohl, Anna-Katharina Patentanwälte Jackisch-Kohl & Kohl Stuttgarter Strasse 115 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07014418.3 | 23.07.2007 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | DE20061036140 | 31.07.2006 Original published format: DE102006036140 | [2008/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1884303 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1884303 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/40, B23Q3/18 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
B23B31/4066 (EP);
B23B31/16191 (EP);
B23Q3/183 (EP);
B23Q2230/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Zentrieren von Werkstücken sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung eines solchen Verfahrens | [2008/06] | English: | Method for centring workpieces and device for performing such a method | [2008/06] | French: | Procédé destiné à centrer des pièces à usiner tout comme dispositif destiné à la réalisation d'un tel procédé | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 19.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.07.2007 | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | IE | 29.02.2012 | IT | 29.02.2012 | LT | 29.02.2012 | LV | 29.02.2012 | MT | 29.02.2012 | NL | 29.02.2012 | PL | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | ES | 09.06.2012 | IS | 29.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | GB | 23.07.2012 | LU | 23.07.2012 | AT | 31.07.2012 | BE | 31.07.2012 | CH | 31.07.2012 | FR | 31.07.2012 | LI | 31.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
GB | 23.07.2012 | ||
LU | 23.07.2012 | ||
AT | 31.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
GB | 23.07.2012 | ||
AT | 31.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
GB | 23.07.2012 | ||
AT | 31.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
MT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
GB | 23.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
GB | 23.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
GB | 23.07.2012 | ||
BE | 31.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
GB | 23.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
FR | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
GB | 23.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
GB | 23.07.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.07.2012 | ||
LI | 31.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IE | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
LV | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
LT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 29.02.2012 | |
IS | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 29.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0442456 (SCHMIDT CLAUS [DE]) [X] 1,17,21 * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 49; figures 2,3 * [A] 24; | [XA]DE19523787 (IOBB PRODUKTIDEEN VORAUSENTWIC [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7-23 * column 1, line 3 - line 14 * * column 3, line 5 - line 66; figures 1,5,6 * [A] 24; | [XA]DE20320084U (HAINBUCH GMBH SPANNENDE TECH [DE]) [X] 1,3,17,21 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0043]; figure 4 *[A] 24 | by applicant | EP0442456 | DE19523787 | DE20320084U |