EP1889603 - Hair dye [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jimbo, Yoshihiro c/o FUJIFILM CORPORATION 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Eri c/o FUJIFILM CORPORATION 577-1, Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 03 /
Shimada, Yasuhiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | 04 /
Sato, Kozo c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577-1, Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07014661.8 | 26.07.2007 | [2008/08] | Priority number, date | JP20060205509 | 28.07.2006 Original published format: JP 2006205509 | JP20070144415 | 31.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007144415 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1889603 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1889603 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61K8/58, A61K8/67, A61Q5/10 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP);
A61K8/19 (EP);
A61K8/36 (EP);
A61K8/365 (EP);
A61K8/466 (EP);
A61K8/4913 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2012/29] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Haarfärbemittel | [2008/08] | English: | Hair dye | [2008/08] | French: | Teinture capillaire | [2008/08] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/45] | 20.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2714753 [ ] (BEECHAM GROUP LTD); | [A]GB1518874 (BEECHAM GROUP LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE2806603 (WELLA AG) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1243249 (DONG SUNG PHARMACEUTICALS CO L [KR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | JP2002348221 [ ] (DONGSUNG PHARM CO LTD); | [A]US2003223944 (LIVOREIL AUDE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [AD]JP2004099502 (KAWADA TSUTOMU) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [XP]EP1704847 (WELLA AG [DE]) [XP] 1-4,7-10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0 11]; example -; claim - * |