EP1845029 - Hose-shaped bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Michalsky, Andreas Künersberg 1 87766 Memmingerberg / DE | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/42] | For all designated states Huhtamaki Ronsberg, Zweigniederlassung der Huhtamaki Deutschland GmbH & Co. KG Heinrich-Nicolaus-Strasse 6 87671 Ronsberg/Allgäu / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/42] | 01 /
Michalsky, Andreas Künersberg 1 87766 Memmingerberg / DE | Representative(s) | Castell, Klaus, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann-Castell Oberstraße 135 52349 Düren / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Castell, Klaus, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann - Castell Willi-Bleicher-Strasse 7 52353 Düren / DE | ||
Former [2012/10] | Castell, Klaus, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Liermann - Castell Gutenbergstrasse 12 52349 Düren / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Popp, Eugen, et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015010.7 | 14.05.2003 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | DE20021021432 | 14.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10221432 | DE20022012251U | 08.08.2002 Original published format: DE 20212251 U | DE20022012250U | 08.08.2002 Original published format: DE 20212250 U | DE20022014197U | 13.09.2002 Original published format: DE 20214197 U | [2007/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1845029 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1845029 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1845029 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/00, B65D30/16, B65D30/20, B65D33/38, B31B1/64 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
B65D3/10 (EP,US);
B65D75/008 (EP);
B65D75/58 (EP);
B65D75/5877 (EP);
B65D75/5883 (EP);
B31B2150/00 (EP,US);
B31B2160/20 (EP,US);
B31B50/59 (EP);
B31B70/64 (EP);
B31B70/844 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | LT | 31.07.2007 | LV | 31.07.2007 | Title | German: | Schlauchförmiger Beutel | [2007/42] | English: | Hose-shaped bag | [2007/42] | French: | Sac tubulaire | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 05.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03010827.8 / EP1362797 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030010827) is 18.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.05.2003 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | IT | 11.07.2012 | MC | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | ES | 22.10.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
MC | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
ES | 22.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 11.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1723470U (BEBO PLASTIK G M B H [DE]) [Y] 5 * the whole document *; | [XDY]AT293944B (SPIESS C F & SOHN [DE]) [XD] 1,2,6,11 * page 2, line 3 - line 5 * * page 2, line 29 - line 33 * * page 3, line 25 - line 26; figure 6 * [Y] 3-5,12,13; | [A]EP0772522 (TRANI GIORGIO [IT]) [A] 2* figures 2,6 *; | [Y]JP2002104446 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD) [Y] 3,4 * abstract *; | [Y]DE20214197U (HUHTAMAKI RONSBERG, ZWEIGNIEDERLASSUNG DER HUHTAMAKI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH) [Y] 12,13 * the whole document *; | [X]DE20212251U (HUHTAMAKI RONSBERG, ZWEIGNIEDERLASSUNG DER HUHTAMAKI DEUTSCHLAND GMBH) [X] 7-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE1723470U | AT293944B | JP2002104446 | DE20214197U | DE20212251U |