25.04.2014 |
Refusal of application |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
13.01.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
03.01.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
27.09.2013 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
24.09.2013 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
20.09.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] |
30.08.2013 |
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
23.08.2013 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
23.07.2013 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] |
10.02.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
03.02.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] |
27.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2009 |
Change - name/address |
published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] |
27.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.03.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
21.11.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.11.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
24.10.2008 |
First examination report |
|
23.10.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.10.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
29.08.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
21.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.02.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
22.02.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
18.08.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|