EP1884340 - Process and apparatus for extrusion moulding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GM Inox S.r.l. Viale dello Sport, 31 21026 Gavirate (VA) / IT | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rossi, Alberto c/o GM Inox S.r.l. Viale dello Sport, 31 21026 Gavirate (VA) / IT | 02 /
Morini, Matteo c/o GM Inox S.r.l. Viale dello Sport, 31 21026 Gavirate (VA) / IT | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07015081.8 | 01.08.2007 | [2008/06] | Priority number, date | EP20060425562 | 03.08.2006 Original published format: EP 06425562 | [2008/06] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1884340 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/50, B29C47/92, B29C45/04, B29C33/36 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
B29C33/36 (EP);
B29C45/06 (EP);
B29C48/04 (EP);
B29C48/2694 (EP);
B29C48/387 (EP);
B29C48/395 (EP);
B29C48/92 (EP);
B29C2948/92514 (EP);
B29C2948/9259 (EP);
B29C2948/92657 (EP);
B29C2948/92704 (EP);
B29C2948/92828 (EP);
B29C2948/92866 (EP);
B29C2948/92895 (EP);
B29C2948/92904 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Extrudieren | [2008/06] | English: | Process and apparatus for extrusion moulding | [2008/06] | French: | Procédé et dipositif d'extrusion | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/11] | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4143374 (BERSTORFF GMBH MASCH HERMANN [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10-13 * page 2, line 33 - page 3, line L; figures 1-3 * [Y] 3-5,8,9; | [Y]JP2003062891 (HITACHI SHIPBUILDING ENG CO) [Y] 3-5,8,9 * paragraphs [0013] - [0017] - [0031] - [0033]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US3526926 (REID RICHARD K) [Y] 3-5,8,9 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 9; figure 1 *; | [A]WO03076160 (VINYLTEC LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 9, line 20 - page 16, line 24; figures 1,2 *; | [XY] - REIMKER M ET AL, "INTRUSIONSANLAGE ZUM AUFARBEITEN GEMISCHTER KUNSTSTOFFE. ÖINTRUSION PLANT FOR REPROCESSING MIXED PLASTICS", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (199301), vol. 83, no. 1, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 23 - 25, XP000330655 [X] 1,2,6,7,10-13 * page 23, line 1 - page 25, line L * [Y] 3-5,8,9 | [A] - CHARLES A. HARPER ET AL., MODERN PLASTICS HANDBOOK, NEW YORK, MCGRAW-HILL, (2000), XP002415903 [A] 1-13 * page 5.36, line 11 - line 23 * |