EP1903111 - Extended cDNAs for secreted proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serono Genetics Institute S.A. Route Nationale 7 91030 Evry Cedex / FR | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bougueleret, Lydie 22, Vieux Chemin d'Onex 1213 Petit Lancy, Geneva / CH | 02 /
Duclert, Aymeric 6 Ter, rue Victorine 94100 Saint-Maur / FR | 03 /
Dumas Milne Edwards, Jean-Baptiste 8, rue Grégoire de Tours 75006 Paris / FR | [2008/17] |
Former [2008/13] | 01 /
Bougueleret, Lydie 108, avenue Victor Hugo 92170 Vanves / FR | ||
02 /
Duclert, Aymeric 6 Ter, rue Victorine 94100 Saint-Maur / FR | |||
03 /
Dumas Milne Edwards, Jean-Baptiste 8, rue Grégoire de Tours 75006 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Russell, Karen A.J., et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Bufton, Karen A.J., et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 07015169.1 | 13.11.1998 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | US19970066677P | 13.11.1997 Original published format: US 66677 P | US19970069957P | 17.12.1997 Original published format: US 69957 P | US19980074121P | 09.02.1998 Original published format: US 74121 P | US19980081563P | 13.04.1998 Original published format: US 81563 P | US19980096116P | 10.08.1998 Original published format: US 96116 P | US19980099273P | 04.09.1998 Original published format: US 99273 P | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903111 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1903111 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | [2008/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/13] | Title | German: | Erweiterte cDNA für sekretierte Proteine | [2008/13] | English: | Extended cDNAs for secreted proteins | [2008/13] | French: | ADN étendus pour protéines secrétées | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 29.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/41] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98952974.8 / EP1029045 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XL]WO9634981 (GENSET SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * [L] ; | [XL]EP0625572 (KANAGAWA KAGAKU GIJUTSU AKAD [JP], et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * [L] ; | [XL]WO9707198 (GENETICS INST [US]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * [L] ; | [X] - "Human mRNA for erythrocyte band 7 integral membrane protein", EMBL, (19910924), Database accession no. X60067, URL: EBI, XP002471111 [X] 2,10,18 * the whole document * | [X] - HIEBL-DIRSCHMIED C M ET AL, "CLONING AND NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE OF COMPLEMENTARY DNA ENCODING HUMAN ERYTHROCYTE BAND 7 INTEGRAL MEMBRANE PROTEIN", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1991), vol. 1090, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3002, pages 123 - 124, XP002471109 [X] 2,10,18 * the whole document * | [A] - GALLAGHER PATRICK G ET AL, "Structure, organization, and expression of the human band 7.2b gene, a candidate gene for hereditary hydrocytosis", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 270, no. 44, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 26358 - 26363, XP002471110 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.44.26358 | [XL] - KATO S ET AL, "Construction of a human full-length cDNA bank", GENE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1994), vol. 150, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 243 - 250, XP002081364 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * [L] DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)90433-2 | [XL] - TASHIRO K ET AL, "SIGNAL SEQUENCE TRAP: A CLONING STRATEGY FOR SECRETED PROTEINS AND TYPE I MEMBRANE PROTEINS", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19930730), vol. 261, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 600 - 603, XP000673204 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * [L] DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.8342023 | [XL] - HEIJNE VON G, "A NEW METHOD FOR PREDICTING SIGNAL SEQUENCE CLEAVAGE SITES", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (1986), vol. 14, no. 11, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 4683 - 4690, XP002053954 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * [L] |