EP1850504 - Method and apparatus for power control of multiple channels in a wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2016/13] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Tao 8826 La Catera San Diego CA 92129 / US | 02 /
Jou, Yu Cheun 9979 Riverhead Drive San Diego CA 92129 / US | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/13] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2010/36] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/44] | Picker, Madeline Margaret, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07015171.7 | 13.02.2001 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | US20000182322P | 14.02.2000 Original published format: US 182322 P | US20010755659 | 05.01.2001 Original published format: US 755659 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1850504 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1850504 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | [2010/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1850504 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/26, H04W52/12, H04W52/16, H04W52/20, H04W52/36, H04W52/40, H04W52/44 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
H04W52/265 (EP,US);
H04W52/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/26 (KR);
H04W52/267 (EP,US);
H04W52/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/44] | H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Leistungssteuerung mehrerer Kanäle in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem | [2007/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for power control of multiple channels in a wireless communication system | [2007/44] | French: | Appareil et procédé de réglage de puissance d'une pluralité de canaux dans un système de communications sans fil | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 07.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01910730.9 / EP1256190 | Divisional application(s) | EP10011030.3 / EP2290835 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010910730) is 27.04.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2016 | BE | 30.03.2016 | CY | 30.03.2016 | DK | 30.03.2016 | ES | 30.03.2016 | FI | 30.03.2016 | IT | 30.03.2016 | MC | 30.03.2016 | NL | 30.03.2016 | SE | 30.03.2016 | TR | 30.03.2016 | GR | 01.07.2016 | PT | 01.08.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
CY | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
MC | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
DK | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
BE | 30.03.2016 | ||
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
IT | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
PT | 01.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 30.03.2016 | |
ES | 30.03.2016 | ||
FI | 30.03.2016 | ||
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
NL | 30.03.2016 | ||
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
SE | 30.03.2016 | ||
GR | 01.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 30.03.2016 | |
GR | 01.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2300546 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]WO9836606 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]WO9858461 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); |