EP1889714 - Multi-layer pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REHAU AG + Co Rheniumhaus 95111 Rehau / DE | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stadthalter, Peter Fürstenforster Str. 49 96152 Burghaslach / DE | 02 /
Liebel, Volker Gleiwitzerstr. 47 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2008/08] | Application number, filing date | 07015241.8 | 03.08.2007 | [2008/08] | Priority number, date | DE20062012609U | 16.08.2006 Original published format: DE 202006012609 U | [2008/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1889714 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B32B7/02, F16L9/12 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
B32B1/08 (EP);
B32B7/022 (EP,US);
F16L11/04 (EP);
F16L9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Title | German: | Mehrschichtiges Rohr | [2008/08] | English: | Multi-layer pipe | [2008/08] | French: | Tuyau multicouche | [2008/08] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]DE20010111U (WAVIN BV [NL]) [DX] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5-13; | [A]EP1199161 (SOLVAY [BE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0012] ** claim 1 *; | [Y]DE202004006812U (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [Y] 5-13 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012] , [0013] , [0016] - [0018] - [0020] * * claims 1,4-10 * | by applicant | EP0869304 | DE20010111U | DE202004006812U | - S.H.BEECH; S.J.PALMER; R.W.BURBIDGE., ""Accelerated Laboratory Tests to Predict the Resistance to Slow Crack Growth of High Performance Polyethylene Pipe Resins"", INTERNATIONAL PLASTIC PIPE SYMPOSIUM., (1997), page 205FF | - M.FLEISSNER., ""Exprience With a Full Notch Creep Test in Determining the Stress Crack Performance of Polyethylenes".", POLYMER ENGINEERING AND SCIENCE., (199802), vol. 38, no. 2 |