EP1852568 - Device for connecting an actuator of a leaf of a swing gate to a post [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Change - representative | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prastel SPA Via del Vetraio 7 40138 Bologna / IT | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Celani, Luigi Viale dei Romagnoli 981 00119 Ostia Antica (Roma) / IT | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Barberi, Vittorio, et al Studio Brevetti Barberi S.r.l. Viale Europa, 101 50126 Firenze / IT | [2010/21] |
Former [2009/21] | Barberi, Vittorio, et al Studio Brevetti Barberi S.r.l. Viale G. Matteotti 1 50121 Firenze / IT | ||
Former [2009/11] | Barberi, Vittorio, et al Studio Brevetti Barberi S.r.l. Viale G. Matteotti, 1 40121 Firenze / IT | ||
Former [2007/45] | Barberi, Vittorio STUDIO BREVETTI BARBERI S.r.l. Via A. Manzoni, 23 50121 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 07015332.5 | 10.12.2003 | [2007/45] | Priority number, date | IT2002MI02656 | 17.12.2002 Original published format: IT MI20022656 | IT2003MI00251 | 12.02.2003 Original published format: IT MI20030251 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1852568 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1852568 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/12 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
E05F15/622 (EP);
E05F15/616 (EP);
E05Y2201/214 (EP);
E05Y2201/244 (EP);
E05Y2201/434 (EP);
E05Y2201/706 (EP);
E05Y2600/32 (EP);
E05Y2600/33 (EP);
E05Y2600/626 (EP);
E05Y2800/232 (EP);
E05Y2800/25 (EP);
E05Y2800/426 (EP);
E05Y2900/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/28] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Verbindung eines Aktuators eines Swing-Gate-Blattes mit einem Pfosten | [2007/46] | English: | Device for connecting an actuator of a leaf of a swing gate to a post | [2007/45] | French: | Dispositif pour raccorder un actionneur de battant de porte oscillante à un poteau | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/45] | Vorrichtung zur Verbindung eines Aktuators eines Blattes eines Swing-Gate mit einem Pfosten | Examination procedure | 07.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03028344.4 / EP1431498 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2209062 (DONOGHUE DECLAN WILLIAM O) [A] 2* page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 3; figure 1 *; | [XA]DE29700583U (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3; claims 1,5,6 * [A] 2-4 |