EP2023542 - Method and device for operating a network and communication system comprising such device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramalho Ribeiro Dos Santos, José Miguel Rua José Cardosa Pires no.1, 8 B 1750-430 Lisboa / PT | [2009/07] | Representative(s) | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60 81617 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/07] | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60 81617 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015402.6 | 06.08.2007 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2023542 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2023542 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/437 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
H04L12/437 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betreiben eines Netzwerks und Kommunikationssystem mit einer derartigen Vorrichtung | [2009/07] | English: | Method and device for operating a network and communication system comprising such device | [2009/07] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'exploitation d'un réseau et système de communication comprenant un tel dispositif | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2010 | BE | 06.10.2010 | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | MT | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 06.10.2010 | |
SI | 06.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6766482 (YIP MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 14,17 * abstract * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 47 * [A] 1-13,15,16,18-21; | [A]US2006215544 (ASA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * figure 14 ** paragraphs [0020] - [0035] *; | [XY]US2006250969 (FLORIT LIONEL [US], et al) [X] 1-13,15,16,18-21 * abstract * * figures 3,5A,5B,6 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0030] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0037] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0053] * [Y] 14,17 |