EP2022475 - Composition for keratin fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KPSS-Kao Professional Salon Services GmbH Pfungstädter Strasse 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2009/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmann, Martin Neckarstrasse 4c 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | 02 /
Molenda, Michael Hersfelder Strasse 9 60487 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
Grit, Mustafa, Dr. Taunusstrasse 4 64579 Gernsheim / DE | [2009/07] | Application number, filing date | 07015477.8 | 07.08.2007 | [2009/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2022475 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/41, A61K8/58, A61Q5/12 | [2009/07] | CPC: |
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
A61K8/416 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/42] |
Former [2009/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung für Keratinfasern | [2009/07] | English: | Composition for keratin fibres | [2009/07] | French: | Composition pour fibres de kératine | [2009/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19950711 (WELLA AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,12 * page 2, line 31 - line 41 * * page 3, line 16 - line 35 * * page 3, line 56 - line 58; claim - *; | [X]EP1787634 (KPSS KAO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6-8,12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0011] * * paragraphs [0018] , [0021]; examples 1-3; claim - *; | [X]WO0015180 (HERCULES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,12 * example 10; claim - *; | [X]US5955066 (SAKO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,12 * column 12, line 41 - line 54; example -; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0006107 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, line 29 - page 9, line 16; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9955295 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * page 10, line 28 - page 13, line 20; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9408557 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 16 - line 19 * * page 3, line 36 - page 7, line 2; example -; claim - * |