EP1887403 - Stereomicroscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITAKA KOHKI CO., LTD. 18-8 Nozaki 1-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-0014 / JP | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Katsushige Mitaka Kohki Co., Ltd. 1-18-8, Nozaki Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-0014 / JP | [2014/41] |
Former [2008/07] | 01 /
Nakamura, Katsushige Mitaka Kohki Co., Ltd. 1-18-8, Nozaki Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181-0014 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015713.6 | 09.08.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | JP20060217083 | 09.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006217083 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1887403 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887403 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G02B21/22, G02B21/36 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
G02B21/0012 (EP,US);
G02B21/22 (EP,US);
G02B21/362 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2008/43] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Stereomikroskop | [2008/07] | English: | Stereomicroscope | [2008/07] | French: | Stéréomicroscope | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 14.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.04.2014 | 02.04.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1120676 (MITAKA KOKI KK [JP]); | [X]EP1333305 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al); | [XY]DE102004059143 (ZEISS CARL AG [DE]) | Examination | US5337177 | US6226118 | WO2005096059 | EP1712945 | by applicant | US5337177 | EP1120676 | EP1333305 | WO2005096059 | DE102004059143 |