EP2034792 - Method and device for data processing and communication system comprising such device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 2-4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2009/11] | Representative(s) | Tognetty, Virpi Maria, et al Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02160 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Tognetty, Virpi Maria, et al Nokia Corporation IPR Department Keilalahdentie 4 01250 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2009/11] | Bruglachner, Thomas E. Nokia Siemens Network GmbH & Co. KG Patentabteilung Postfach 80 17 60 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015716.9 | 09.08.2007 | [2009/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2034792 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
H04W72/23 (EP);
H04W74/0833 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Datenverarbeitung und Kommunikationssystem mit einer derartigen Vorrichtung | [2009/11] | English: | Method and device for data processing and communication system comprising such device | [2009/11] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de traitement de données et système de communication comprenant un tel dispositif | [2009/11] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2009/38] | 09.05.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004034656 (GOLDEN BRIDGE TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0037] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 2-9,11-13; | [A]EP1447943 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0021] * * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]WO2004100598 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 1, line 4 - line 6 * * page 2, line 20 - line 27 * * page 5, line 3 - page 6, line 2 * * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 29 * * page 11, line 23 - page 12, line 9 * * page 13, line 1 - line 19 * * figure 2 * [Y] 2-9,11-13; | [A]EP1513367 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0028] * * figures 2A,2B *; | [A]WO2006117078 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 1, line 5 - line 12 * * page 4, line 7 - line 21 * * page 8, line 9 - page 9, line 12 * * figure 5 *; | [T] - NOKIA, "Comparison of methods for resource assignment", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #51, R1-074665, (20071105), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_51/Docs/, (20080206), XP002467706 [T] 1-13 * the whole document * | [T] - NOKIA, "Resource assignment for E-DCH access in CELL_FACH state", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #50BIS, R1-074303, (20071008), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_50b/Docs/, (20080206), XP002467707 [T] 1-13 * the whole document * |