EP1886793 - Method and device for manufacturing a 3D object and use of a plastifying unit for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hehl, Karl Arthur-Hehl-Strasse 72290 Lossburg / DE | [2010/25] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Hehl, Karl Arthur-Hehl-Strasse 72290 Lossburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Harry RPK Patentanwälte Reinhardt, Pohlmann und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB Grünstrasse 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Reinhardt, Harry Reinhardt & Pohlmann Partnerschaft, Grünstrasse 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015802.7 | 10.08.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | DE20061037927 | 11.08.2006 Original published format: DE102006037927 | [2008/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886793 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1886793 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/00 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
B29C64/112 (EP);
B29C45/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung eines dreidimensionalen Gegenstandes sowie Verwendung einer Plastifiziereinheit zu dessen Herstellung | [2008/07] | English: | Method and device for manufacturing a 3D object and use of a plastifying unit for its manufacture | [2008/07] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés à la fabrication d'un objet en trois dimensions et utilisation d'une unité plastifiée pour sa fabrication | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 04.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.03.2011 | DK | 02.03.2011 | EE | 02.03.2011 | FI | 02.03.2011 | HU | 02.03.2011 | LT | 02.03.2011 | LV | 02.03.2011 | MT | 02.03.2011 | RO | 02.03.2011 | SE | 02.03.2011 | SK | 02.03.2011 | BG | 02.06.2011 | GR | 03.06.2011 | ES | 13.06.2011 | IS | 02.07.2011 | PT | 04.07.2011 | LU | 10.08.2011 | BE | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
LU | 10.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
DK | 02.03.2011 | ||
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
MT | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
RO | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
SK | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
IS | 02.07.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
EE | 02.03.2011 | ||
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
PT | 04.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 02.03.2011 | |
FI | 02.03.2011 | ||
LT | 02.03.2011 | ||
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
BG | 02.06.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 02.03.2011 | |
LV | 02.03.2011 | ||
SE | 02.03.2011 | ||
GR | 03.06.2011 | ||
ES | 13.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002111707 (LI ZHIMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-18* paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0071] * |