EP2030688 - Locking device with a gaiter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Bonaduz AG Via Crusch 7402 Bonaduz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Hamilton Bonaduz AG Via Crusch CH-7402 Bonaduz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nay, Renato Dalaus 7425 Masein / CH | 02 /
Pochert, Jörg Vogelsangweg 12 7000 Chur / CH | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Trossin, Hans-Jürgen, et al Weickmann & Weickmann, Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07015903.3 | 13.08.2007 | [2009/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2030688 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/14, G01N35/00 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
G01N35/0099 (EP);
B01L3/50825 (EP);
B65D39/0076 (EP);
B01L2200/0689 (EP);
B01L2300/041 (EP);
G01N2035/00287 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/46] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verschlussanordnung mit Balg | [2009/10] | English: | Locking device with a gaiter | [2009/10] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture à soufflet | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/11] | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO03083335 (HALKEY ROBERTS CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-20; | [A]EP0676643 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US3601152 (KENWORTHY GRANT F) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2027169 (IMED CORP) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US4312695 (WILLIS W COY) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |