EP1955943 - Transport ship, in particular cargo ship [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosenkranz, Volker H. Urbanisacion Pena Grande 2 15590 Ferrol / ES | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Richter, Werdermann, Gerbaulet & Hofmann Neuer Wall 10 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016019.7 | 15.08.2007 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | DE20072002227U | 12.02.2007 Original published format: DE 202007002227 U | [2008/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1955943 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1955943 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955943 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B63B27/00, B63B35/00, B63B35/30 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
B63B15/00 (EP);
B63B17/023 (EP);
B63B27/143 (EP);
B63H9/061 (EP);
B63B25/004 (EP);
B63B25/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | Transportschiff, insbesondere Frachtschiff | [2008/33] | English: | Transport ship, in particular cargo ship | [2008/33] | French: | Bateau de transport, en particulier cargo | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | LT | 24.02.2010 | MT | 24.02.2010 | SI | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | IS | 24.06.2010 | LU | 15.08.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
MT | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
MT | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
IT | 15.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 24.02.2010 | |
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | LT | 24.02.2010 | |
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2457214 (PHB SOMERAL SARL) [A] 1 * figure -; claims 1,2 *; | [AD]JPS6285796 (SENPAKU GIJUTSU KAIHATSU KK, et al) [AD] 1,3 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0970883 (CONSTRUCTIEBEDRIJF WILLEMS B V [NL]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]US2002069806 (LE COZ DANIEL [FR], et al) [AD] 1* abstract * |