EP1925388 - Circular saw bench [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metabowerke GmbH Metabo-Allee 1 72602 Nürtingen / DE | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruf, Hans Feuerleinstrasse 2 72649 Wolfschlugen / DE | 02 /
Schulz, Manfred Hafnerstrasse 11 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Raunecker, Klaus Peter, et al Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Raunecker, Klaus Peter, et al Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/22] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016041.1 | 16.08.2007 | [2008/22] | Priority number, date | DE20061055018 | 22.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006055018 | [2008/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925388 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1925388 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B23D45/06, B27G19/02 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
B23D45/06 (EP);
B27G19/02 (EP);
B27G19/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/06] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tischkreissäge | [2008/22] | English: | Circular saw bench | [2008/22] | French: | Scie circulaire à table | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 13.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.07.2012 | [2013/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB662756 (ARTHUR WILFRED HUNT) [A] 1 * figure 4 *; | [A]NL6703368 (JAN VAN MAASTRICHT) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 6-12 * * page 3, line 26 - page 5, line 2 * * figure - *; | [DA]US2001035081 (SUTTON STEPHEN O [US]) [DA] 1 * column W *; | [A]US1594772 (FOURNIER CHARLES N) [A] 1 * Seite 1; Zeilen 57 bis 97; Abbildungen 1,2 *; | [DA]DE10348587 (P & F BROTHER IND CORP [TW]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US1563317 (AUEL CARL B) [A] 1 * Seite 1, Zeile 81 - Seite 2, Zeile 21; Abbildung 5 * |