Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] |
12.03.2010 | Definitive list of designations | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] |
10.03.2010 | New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit | |
08.01.2010 | First examination report | |
06.01.2010 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
01.09.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.07.2009 | Publication of search report | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] |
22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] |
25.01.2008 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
25.01.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |