EP1947425 - Velocity indicator for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US | [2018/09] |
Former [2017/34] | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 5757 North Green Bay Avenue Milwaukee, WI 53209 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Johnson Controls Technology Company 49200 Halyard Drive Plymouth Michigan 48170 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Süss, Manfred Uhlandstrasse 7 75196 Remchingen / DE | 02 /
Voillot, Stéphane 16, Clos de D'Alizier 95800 Courdimanche / FR | 03 /
Croy, Jean-Luc 12, Allée Van Gogh 94450 Limeil Brevannes / FR | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/09] | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/44] | Hemmelmann, Klaus, et al Johnson Controls GmbH Industriestrasse 20-30 51399 Burscheid / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Bloch, Gérard, et al Cabinet Bloch & Gevers 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07016623.6 | 24.08.2007 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | DE20071003355 | 18.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007003355 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947425 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1947425 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01D11/28, G01D13/26 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
G01D11/28 (EP);
G01D13/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geschwindigkeitsanzeiger für ein Fahrzeug | [2008/30] | English: | Velocity indicator for vehicle | [2008/30] | French: | Indicateur de vitesse pour véhicule | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.08.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 10.08.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.08.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2007 | AT | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | DK | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | ES | 28.02.2018 | FI | 28.02.2018 | IT | 28.02.2018 | LT | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | NL | 28.02.2018 | PL | 28.02.2018 | PT | 28.02.2018 | RO | 28.02.2018 | SE | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | TR | 28.02.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | GR | 29.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | IE | 24.08.2018 | LU | 24.08.2018 | MT | 24.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | FR | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 24.08.2007 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
IE | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 24.08.2018 | ||
MT | 24.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 24.08.2007 | |
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PT | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 24.08.2018 | ||
MT | 24.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
TR | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 24.08.2018 | ||
MT | 24.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 24.08.2018 | ||
MT | 24.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 24.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
LU | 24.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
DK | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
PL | 28.02.2018 | ||
RO | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
SE | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 29.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
ES | 28.02.2018 | ||
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
FI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LT | 28.02.2018 | ||
NL | 28.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3909670 (WAKAMATSU HISATO, et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 24 - line 60; figure 1 *; | [A]US6408783 (LUDEWIG BERND [DE]) [A] 3* abstract *; | [DY]FR2874265 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US]) [DY] 1,2 * the whole document * |