EP1895530 - Spherical-aberration compensating element, fabricating method thereof, and optical pickup device including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1 Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasabe, Mitsuyoshi c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Hitoshi c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 03 /
Nagashima, Kenji c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-7-1, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016650.9 | 24.08.2007 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | JP20060228759 | 25.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006228759 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1895530 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/135 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
G11B7/1353 (EP,US);
G11B7/1369 (EP,US);
G11B7/13925 (EP,US);
G02F1/13342 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, PL [2008/46] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Element zum Ausgleich der sphärischen Abberation, Herstellungsverfahren dafür und optisches Abtastgerät damit | [2008/10] | English: | Spherical-aberration compensating element, fabricating method thereof, and optical pickup device including the same | [2008/10] | French: | Elément de compensation à aberration sphérique, son procédé de fabrication, et dispositif de capture optique l'utilisant | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 06.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 08.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5748272 (TANAKA KEIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 9 - column 16; figures 6,8,10-17 * [Y] 4,5; | [YA]US2006146206 (KIM TAE-KYUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 4,5 * the whole document * [A] 1-3; | [XA]WO0114938 (DIGILENS INC [US]) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [A] 4,5; | [XA]EP1635231 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 2,4,5; | [DA]JPH1092000 (NEC CORP) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1615213 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [PA]EP1742100 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [PA] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5748272 | US2006146206 |