EP1947197 - Method for the amplification of at least one nucleic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schreiter, Matthias Seumestrasse 7 81379 München / DE | 02 /
Stanzel, Manfred, Dr. Taunusstrasse 100 91056 Erlangen / DE | [2008/30] | Application number, filing date | 07016658.2 | 24.08.2007 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947197 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6825 (EP);
C12Q1/6851 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6825, C12Q2561/113, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2531/113 (EP);
C12Q1/6851, C12Q2565/607, C12Q2537/143, C12Q2531/113 (EP) | Designated contracting states | [2009/14] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Amplifizierung mindestens einer Nukleinsäure | [2008/30] | English: | Method for the amplification of at least one nucleic acid | [2008/30] | French: | Procédé pour l'amplification d'au moins un acide nucléique | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/33] | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03100413 (ATONOMICS APS [DK], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-3,7,8,10 * * page 24, paragraph 5 - page 25 *; | [X]WO2005114166 (ATONOMICS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims 16-23 * * paragraphs [0112] - [0115] - [0229] - [0232] *; | [X]WO0220832 (ATONOMICS APS [DK], et al) [X] 1-14 * claims 1-7,9 * * page 6, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 4 * * pages 13-15 * * page 32 * * figure 16 *; | [DA] - GABL R ET AL, "First results on label-free detection of DNA and protein molecules using a novel integrated sensor technology based on gravimetric detection principles", BIOSENSORS & BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (20030911), vol. 19, no. 6, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 615 - 620, XP002320316 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(03)00259-8 | [A] - LECHUGA ET AL, "A highly sensitive microsystem based on nanomechanical biosensors for genomics applications", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH, (20061025), vol. 118, no. 1-2, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 2 - 10, XP005623131 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.snb.2006.04.017 | [A] - CHENG ET AL, "Nanotechnologies for biomolecular detection and medical diagnostics", CURRENT OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY LTD, LONDON, GB, (200602), vol. 10, no. 1, ISSN 1367-5931, pages 11 - 19, XP005286543 [A] * page 16, column 2 - page 18 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cbpa.2006.01.006 | [A] - MCKENDRY R ET AL, "MULTIPLE LABEL-FREE BIODETECTION AND QUANTITATIVE DNA-BINDING ASSAYS ON A NANOMECHANICAL CANTILEVER ARRAY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20020723), vol. 99, no. 15, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 9783 - 9788, XP001172813 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.152330199 | [DA] - SU M ET AL, "MICROCANTILEVER RESONANCE-BASED DNA DETECTION WITH NANOPARTICLE PROBES", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (20030519), vol. 82, no. 20, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 3562 - 3564, XP001171427 [DA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1576915 | [A] - HANSEN ET AL, "Microcantilever biosensors", METHODS : A COMPANION TO METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (200509), vol. 37, no. 1, ISSN 1046-2023, pages 57 - 64, XP005109759 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymeth.2005.05.011 |