EP1894900 - Catalyst-aided chemical processing method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/28] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka 565-0871 / JP | ||
For all designated states EBARA CORPORATION 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamauchi, Kazuto c/o Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Sano, Yasuhisa c/o Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka / JP | 03 /
Hara, Hideyuki c/o Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka / JP | 04 /
Murata, Junji c/o Osaka University 1-1, Yamadaoka Suita-shi Osaka / JP | 05 /
Yagi, Keita c/o Ebara Corporation 11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07016757.2 | 27.08.2007 | [2008/10] | Priority number, date | JP20060231095 | 28.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006231095 | JP20060283781 | 18.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006283781 | JP20060328287 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006328287 | JP20060328331 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006328331 | JP20060328515 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006328515 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1894900 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1894900 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C03C15/00, C04B41/00, C23F1/00, C30B33/00, H01L21/04, H01L21/306, H01L21/321, H01L21/3213 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
C23F1/02 (EP,US);
C23C18/145 (EP,US);
C23C8/40 (EP,US);
C23F1/26 (EP);
C23F1/30 (EP);
C25B11/00 (EP);
C25D21/12 (EP,US);
C25D5/06 (EP,US);
H01L21/02348 (US);
H01L21/30612 (EP,US);
H01L21/31051 (US);
H01L21/32115 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/10] | C03C15/00, C04B41/00, C23F1/00, C30B33/00, H01L21/04, H01L21/306, H01L21/321 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2010/43] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Katalysatorgestütztes chemisches Verarbeitungsverfahren und entsprechende Vorrichtung | [2008/10] | English: | Catalyst-aided chemical processing method and apparatus | [2008/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil de traitement chimique à l'aide d'un catalyseur | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 25.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 31.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/32] | Divisional application(s) | EP11006032.4 / EP2381008 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02057382 (CABOT MICROELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 8-11,13,15-18,20,22-23 * paragraphs [0019] , [0023] , [0024] , [0035] , [0038] , [0062] , [0066] *; | [X]JP2002346915 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP) [X] 8-9,11,13,15-16 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] - [0013] - [0016] *; | [X]US2003230493 (MORI YUZO [JP], et al) [X] 8,11-14,24,26 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0035] , [0046]; figures 1,3-5,8 *; | [X]US6835120 (MATSUI MASAKI [JP]) [X] 8-11,13,15-18,20,22-25,27-28,30 * column 3, line 63 - column 9, line 24; figures 1,10-13; claims 1,12,13 *; | [AD]JP2006114632 (YAMAUCHI KAZUTO, et al) [AD] 1,6 * paragraphs [0013] - [0020]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0021] - [0024]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0034]; figure 9 * * paragraph [0037] *; | [X]US2006180788 (SCOTT BRANDON S [US], et al) [X] 31-34,37-40 * paragraphs [0090] , [0123] - [0144] - [0150] - [0204] - [0279] - [0283] - [0308] - [0311] - [0318] - [0335] - [0343] , [0344] *; | [X] - BARDWELL J A ET AL, "Ultraviolet photoenhanced wet etching of GaN in K2S2O8 solution", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (20010401), vol. 89, no. 7, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 4142 - 4149, XP012053261 [X] 31-32,34-36 * abstract * * paragraphs [00II] , [III.B] , [00IV] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1352684 |