EP1857200 - Flaskless molding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SINTOKOGIO, LTD. 28-12, Meieki 3-chome, Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 450-0002 / JP | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirata, Minoru Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken 442-0061 / JP | 02 /
Komiyama, Takayuki Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken 442-0061 / JP | 03 /
Oya, Toshihiko Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken 442-0061 / JP | 04 /
Sakai, Tsuyoshi Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken 442-0061 / JP | 05 /
Sakaguchi, Koichi Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken 442-0061 / JP | [2010/38] |
Former [2007/47] | 01 /
Hirata, Minoru Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken 442-0061 / JP | ||
02 /
Komiyama, Takayuki Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken 442-0061 / JP | |||
03 /
Oya, Toshihiko Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken 442-0061 / JP | |||
04 /
Sakai, Tsuyoshi Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken 442-0061 / JP | |||
05 /
Sakaguchi, Toyokawa Sintokogio, Ltd. Toyokawa Seisakusho 1, Honohara 3-chome Toyokawa-shi, Aichi-ken 442-0061 / JP | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Thum, Bernhard Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017130.1 | 31.08.2007 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | JP20070138700 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: JP 2007138700 | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1857200 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1857200 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1857200 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B22C11/10 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
B22C11/10 (EP,KR,US);
B22C17/06 (KR);
B22C21/02 (KR);
B22C7/04 (KR);
B22C9/108 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Title | German: | Kastenlose Formmaschine | [2007/47] | English: | Flaskless molding machine | [2007/47] | French: | Machine à mouler en motte | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 04.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2010 | BE | 06.10.2010 | CY | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | IT | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | MT | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | ES | 17.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/26] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
CY | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
MT | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 06.10.2010 | |
BE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 06.10.2010 | |
SI | 06.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0243901 (GEORG FISCHER DISA AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-8 * page 6, line 15 - page 8, line 5; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP1695776 (SINTOKOGIO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-8* figures 8,9; claim 12 *; | [X]EP1726382 (SINTOKOGIO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-13; claims 1-11 * |