EP2031705 - Clamping unit with several clamping points for electric contacts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fröhlich, Paul Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 5 92237 Sulzbach-Rosenberg / DE | 02 /
Schmidt, Carsten Dompfaffstrasse 35 91088 Bubenreuth / DE | [2009/10] | Application number, filing date | 07017267.1 | 03.09.2007 | [2009/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2031705 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48, H01R4/50, H01R4/24 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
H01R4/489 (EP);
H01R4/4837 (EP,US);
H01R4/5008 (EP);
H01R4/505 (EP);
H01R9/24 (EP);
H01R4/4821 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2009/46] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Klemmeinheit mit mehreren Klemmstellen zur elektrischen Kontaktierung | [2009/10] | English: | Clamping unit with several clamping points for electric contacts | [2009/10] | French: | Unité de borne dotée de plusieurs borne en vue de l'établissement d'un contact électrique | [2009/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9825325 (ATLANTIS SOLAR SYSTEME AG [CH], et al); | [X]DE19961764 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]WO0147067 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) |