EP1857800 - Pressure measurement cell with temperature sensors and method for measuring pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstr. 1 - 5 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jacob, Jörn Talstrasse 84a 77709 Wolfach-Kirnbach / DE | 02 /
Böhler, Ewald Obere Rehbergstrasse 11 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2008/17] |
Former [2007/47] | 01 /
Jacob, Jörn Talstrasse 100 77709 Wolfach-Kirnbach / DE | ||
02 /
Böhler, Ewald Obere Rehbergstrasse 11 77709 Wolfach / DE | Representative(s) | Göhring, Robert Westphal - Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Göhring, Robert Westphal - Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Göhring, Robert Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07017655.7 | 18.07.2001 | [2007/47] | Priority number, date | DE2000144078 | 07.09.2000 Original published format: DE 10044078 | [2007/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1857800 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1857800 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1857800 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01L19/00, G01L19/04, G01L9/00 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
G01L9/0075 (EP);
G01L9/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/47] | Title | German: | Druckmessverfahren mit einem Temperatursensor | [2007/47] | English: | Pressure measurement cell with temperature sensors and method for measuring pressure | [2007/47] | French: | Cellule de mesure de la pression avec des capteurs de temperature et procédé de mesure de la pression | [2007/47] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01117319.2 / EP1186875 | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5394345 (BERARD MICHEL V [FR], et al) [A] 12 * column 3, line 22 - column 4, line 2; figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]US5383367 (BERTRAND PIERRE [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 1, line 33 - line 46 * * column 3, line 47 - line 53; claim 6 * |